This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 12:11:17 (UTC).

VANCE vs JAMKE

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 VANCE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JAMKE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1674

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMIE VANCE

MICHAEL VANCE

Defendants

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF VERLIE I. NEWQUIST BELIEVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH PERSON

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF JAMES W. NEWQUIST BELIEVED TO BE DECEASED, AND ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH PERSON

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE THERETO

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

NOVA FINANCIAL & INVESTMENT CORPORATION

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC

TITLE RESOURCES GUARANTY COMPANY

COACHELLA VALLEY WATER DISTRICT

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC

GTE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS CORPORATION

GENERAL TELEPHONE COMPANY

EQUITY TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON LAW FIRM APC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/07/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/07/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/07/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/06/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/07/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

09/07/2023: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

06/14/2023: 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

Summons on first amended complaint

06/14/2023: Summons on first amended complaint

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

06/06/2023: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Notice of Pendency of Action on Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

04/21/2023: Notice of Pendency of Action on Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE MICHAEL VANCE; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230908-00877.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230908-00902.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230908-00920.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Quiet Title of MICHAEL VANCE; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/13/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230413-01606.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/13/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230413-01606.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Quiet Title

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Verified Complaint: For Specific Performance of Contract for Purchase and Sale for Real Property; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Declaration Re: Known or Believed Death of Necessary Parties James W. Newquist and Verlie I. Newquist; Filed By: MICHAEL VANCE; JAMIE VANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less