This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/10/2023 at 13:13:02 (UTC).

LEE ANTU-CHOATE vs BIG LOTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2023 LEE ANTU-CHOATE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIG LOTS, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2241

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

Defendants

LISA DOE

MGP XII MAGNOLIA, LLC

BIG LOTS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL AZIZI

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

05/02/2023: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/02/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

05/02/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

05/02/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

05/02/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

05/02/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

05/17/2023: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

Amended Notice of Case Reassignment for All Purposes (Department 10) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

06/29/2023: Amended Notice of Case Reassignment for All Purposes (Department 10) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

07/28/2023: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

 

Docket Entries

10/30/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Amended Notice of Case Reassignment for All Purposes (Department 10) on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230502-01366.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/02/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230502-01366.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed By: STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of STEVEN LEE ANTU-CHOATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less