This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 09:49:04 (UTC).

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/18/2023 WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher B. Harmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1724

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Christopher B. Harmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON P. WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

04/18/2023: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

04/18/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/18/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

04/20/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over

04/20/2023: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

04/25/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Christopher B. Harmon; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230425-00812.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/20/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230420-00438.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/20/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230420-00438.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less