This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 12:52:24 (UTC).

AGUILAR vs CRST EXPEDITED, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 AGUILAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CRST EXPEDITED, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1152

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Defendants

ARNOLDO RAMOS ROMERO

CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC

CRST INTERNATIONAL, INC

CRST THE TRANSPORTATION SOLUTION, INC

CRST EXPEDITED, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN KSAJIKIAN, ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BENJAMIN ROSS TRACHTMAN JANE E. SCHWED

BENJAMIN ROSS TRACHTMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

09/01/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Certificate of Mailing

09/01/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/01/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

09/05/2023: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

08/21/2023: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

08/21/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

08/17/2023: Plaintiff's Notice of Posting Jury Fees on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

08/17/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Demand for Jury Trial of Defendant Arnoldo Ramos Romero on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

06/09/2023: Demand for Jury Trial of Defendant Arnoldo Ramos Romero on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Answer of Defendant Arnoldo Ramos Romero to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

06/09/2023: Answer of Defendant Arnoldo Ramos Romero to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

05/24/2023: Demand for Jury Trial on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

05/24/2023: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

05/10/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

03/29/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

Notice of Department Assignment

03/08/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

03/08/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

03/07/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

03/07/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2023
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR, JOHN KSAJIKIAN, ESQ.; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230823-01071.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230823-01071.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR; Filed By: ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230308-00597.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230308-00597.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of ALEXANDRA HOLGUIN AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less