This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 09:10:29 (UTC).

MEATH vs DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 04/04/2023 MEATH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1577

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTINA MEATH

Cross Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Defendants

PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER

CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIVIAN W. LIN

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DARREN M. EBNER

CATHERINE ANN GAYER

 

Court Documents

Palm Springs Cultural Center's Answer to Desert Community College District's Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER

08/24/2023: Palm Springs Cultural Center's Answer to Desert Community College District's Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER

Desert Community College District aka College of the Desert's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Palm Springs Cultural Center on Cross-Complaint of PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER

08/16/2023: Desert Community College District aka College of the Desert's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Palm Springs Cultural Center on Cross-Complaint of PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER

Summons Issues and Filed - Cross Complaint

08/07/2023: Summons Issues and Filed - Cross Complaint

Cross-Complaint

08/07/2023: Cross-Complaint

Palm Springs Cultural Center's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

08/07/2023: Palm Springs Cultural Center's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TBD

08/01/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Cross-Complaint of TBD

Notice of Document Return.

07/31/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

07/18/2023: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Summons - Cross-Complaint

07/17/2023: Summons - Cross-Complaint

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

07/10/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

Cross-Complaint in Interpleader

06/15/2023: Cross-Complaint in Interpleader

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

06/15/2023: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

06/06/2023: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Notice of Department Assignment

04/06/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

04/06/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

04/04/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/04/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/04/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023

HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint of TBD DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH SANTINA MEATH; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/25/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230825-00326.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Palm Springs Cultural Center's Answer to Desert Community College District's Cross-Complaint on Cross-Complaint of PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER; Filed By: PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/17/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230817-00144.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Desert Community College District aka College of the Desert's Answer to Cross-Complaint of Palm Springs Cultural Center on Cross-Complaint of PALM SPRINGS CULTURAL CENTER; Filed By: DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230808-00096.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230808-00096.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/08/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230808-01060.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
06/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230406-01266.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230406-01266.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: SANTINA MEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SANTINA MEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SANTINA MEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SANTINA MEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of SANTINA MEATH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less