This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 11:00:40 (UTC).

CASANOVA vs SELENE FINANCE LP

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 CASANOVA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELENE FINANCE LP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Chapman and James Latting. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2880

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

David M. Chapman

James Latting

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHARON CASANOVA

Defendants

SELENE FINANCE LP

SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dennis Alan Rasmussen

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

06/21/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

06/15/2021: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

06/15/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

06/15/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

09/20/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

09/20/2021: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

09/20/2021: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

09/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

09/30/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

Notice of Document Return.

09/30/2021: Notice of Document Return.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to defendant(s); Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA; Filed By: SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/21/2021; Fine Description: Check #4001845 Receipt No.: 20210621-00315.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: SHARON CASANOVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of SHARON CASANOVA; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 09/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING is a litigant

Latest cases where SELENE FINANCE, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASMUSSEN DENNIS ALAN