This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 02:38:45 (UTC).

CAO vs FIRST HORIZON CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 CAO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FIRST HORIZON CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3902

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUONG CAO

KATHY CAO

Defendants

FIRST HORIZON CORPORATION

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, (N.A.)

FIRST HORIZON BANK

CHASE

ALL PERSONS KNOWN AND UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert John Spitz

Defendant Attorney

NABEEL M. ZUBERI

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

08/23/2021: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/23/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/23/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/26/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Document Return.

10/19/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

10/19/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

10/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

10/18/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'S Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

10/28/2021: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'S Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/29/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211029-00144.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'S Verified Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO; Filed By: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, (N.A.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO; Filed By: HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO; Filed By: HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2007 Receipt No.: 20210826-00509.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000); Filed By: HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of HUONG CAO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIRST HORIZON A DIVISION OF FIRST TENNESSEE BANK NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Chase is a litigant

Latest cases where First Horizon Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant