This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 12:39:22 (UTC).

CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI) vs MARSHALL

Case Summary

On 02/15/2022 CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC CCMSI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARSHALL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marie E. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1123

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Marie E. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

Defendant

DINI MARSHALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER VINCENT FITZPATRICK

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

02/15/2022: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

02/15/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

02/15/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

02/18/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

02/18/2022: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Marie E. Wood; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220218-00475.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220218-00475.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 04/16/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CANNON COCHRAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC. (CCMSI)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less