This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 14:23:51 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY vs HUERTA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUERTA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5217

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MARLENE HUERTA

JUAN CASTRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK NIVINSKUS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

10/08/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Department Assignment

10/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Certificate of Counsel.

10/04/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/04/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages

10/04/2021: Statement of Damages

Summons Issued and Filed

10/04/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

10/04/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

11/01/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

11/01/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY; Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/08/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211008-00570.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) on Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Statement of Damages; Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000); Filed By: CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT