This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/23/2021 at 00:10:34 (UTC).

CACERES & CACERES

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 CACERES CACERES was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3504

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIZABETH CACERES

Respondent

ARMANDO LEONEL CACERES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Roger Stuart Shafer

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/25/2021; Fine Description: Check #8533 Receipt No.: 20210825-00091.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Failure to Bring Case to Trial or Judgment; Expiration Date: 08/24/2026; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non Proof of Service of Summons and Petition; Expiration Date: 08/24/2024; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Schedule a Case Status Conference; Expiration Date: 08/25/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ELIZABETH CACERES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: ELIZABETH CACERES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: ELIZABETH CACERES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by ELIZABETH CACERES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFER ROGER STUART