This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 11:00:05 (UTC).

BUSTAMANTE vs DPDW, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 BUSTAMANTE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DPDW, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATHAN BUSTAMANTE

Defendants

DPDW, INC

EXETER FINANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT B. MOBASSERI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/14/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

12/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

12/01/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/01/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/01/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

12/01/2021: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department S303

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/14/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211214-00283.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/30/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: NATHAN BUSTAMANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: NATHAN BUSTAMANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: NATHAN BUSTAMANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000); Filed By: NATHAN BUSTAMANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Contract (Over $25,000) of NATHAN BUSTAMANTE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DPDW INC is a litigant

Latest cases where EXETER FINANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.