This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 20:06:32 (UTC).

BURTENSHAW vs PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION,

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 BURTENSHAW filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kira L. Klatchko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6038

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kira L. Klatchko

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DARREN BURTENSHAW

GEORGE BURTENSHAW

JESSICA KOCHIK

KATHERINA BRYANT

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION

HERC RENTALS INC.

CODY JOSEPH BRYAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

HERC RENTALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIVIAN W. LIN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN N. HEFFERNAN

ROSEMARIE SUAZO LEWIS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEMARIE SUAZO LEWIS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

12/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

12/13/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

12/13/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

12/13/2021: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

12/16/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

12/17/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

12/21/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

01/12/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

01/18/2022: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

01/18/2022: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

Notice of Document Return.

01/20/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Cross-Complaint of Herc Rentals, INC. for Equitable Indemnity, Apportionment of Fault and Declaratory Relief

01/12/2022: Cross-Complaint of Herc Rentals, INC. for Equitable Indemnity, Apportionment of Fault and Declaratory Relief

Summons Issued and Filed

01/12/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of HERC RENTALS INC.,

01/28/2022: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of HERC RENTALS INC.,

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira L. Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/28/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220128-01195.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Cross-Complaint of HERC RENTALS INC.,; Filed By: PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION,; CODY JOSEPH BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220127-00593.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220118-01473.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220118-01473.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220118-01473.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220118-01473.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Posting Jury Fees. on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW; Filed By: PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION,; CODY JOSEPH BRYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW; Filed By: DARREN BURTENSHAW; GEORGE BURTENSHAW; JESSICA KOCHIK; KATHERINA BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9090 Receipt No.: 20211213-00300.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/13/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9090 Receipt No.: 20211213-00300.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: DARREN BURTENSHAW; GEORGE BURTENSHAW; JESSICA KOCHIK; KATHERINA BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: DARREN BURTENSHAW; GEORGE BURTENSHAW; JESSICA KOCHIK; KATHERINA BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: DARREN BURTENSHAW; GEORGE BURTENSHAW; JESSICA KOCHIK; KATHERINA BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: DARREN BURTENSHAW; GEORGE BURTENSHAW; JESSICA KOCHIK; KATHERINA BRYANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of DARREN BURTENSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMORIS SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEWIS ROSEMARIE SUAZO