Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 01:48:21 (UTC).

BURNS vs STARBUCKS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 BURNS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STARBUCKS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2114

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENDA BURNS

Defendants

NEWMARK MERRILL COMPANIES, INC

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey Paul Norton

Defendant Attorney

Samuel S. Baxter

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

07/02/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

07/02/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

Starbucks Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff Brenda Burns' Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

06/11/2021: Starbucks Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff Brenda Burns' Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

05/14/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

05/11/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

05/11/2021: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Summons Issued and Filed

04/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

04/30/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

04/30/2021: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • HearingType: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Notice of Jury Fee Deposit; Filed By: STARBUCKS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1005 Receipt No.: 20210617-00631.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/17/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1005 Receipt No.: 20210617-00631.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Starbucks Corporation's Notice of Jury Fee Deposit; Filed By: STARBUCKS CORPORATION; Confidential: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Starbucks Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff Brenda Burns' Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS; Filed By: STARBUCKS CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS; Filed By: BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/11/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3662 Receipt No.: 20210511-00279.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of BRENDA BURNS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWMARK MERRILL COMPANIES INC. A CALIFORNIA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baxter, Samuel S.