This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 13:53:40 (UTC).

BROYLES vs W.G. YATES & SONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 BROYLES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against W G YATES SONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0324

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALFRED BROYLES, JR

Defendants

W.G. YATES & SONS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

KHS&S CONTRACTORS

KEENAN, HOPKINS, SUDER & STOWELL CONTRACTORS

MOOREFIELD CONSTRUCTION, INC

Interested Party

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Demos Phaon Anagnos

Defendant Attorneys

Hans C. Ruschke

Michael D. Hirsch

Interested Party Attorney

Tyrone Matthews

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

10/28/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Case Management Statement

07/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

10/15/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Notice of Statutory Workers' Compensation Lien

08/05/2021: Notice of Statutory Workers' Compensation Lien

Request for Notice

08/05/2021: Request for Notice

Certificate of Mailing

07/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/30/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Defendant W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

07/16/2021: Defendant W.G. Yates & Sons Construction Company's Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

07/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Firm Address

07/14/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Address

Case Management Statement

07/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention by OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

07/15/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention by OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-intervention

07/14/2021: Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-intervention

Notice of Document Return.

06/21/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

06/21/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Proposed Order Re Motion for Leave to File Complaint-In-Intervention; Motion for Leave to File Complaint-In-Intervention; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Tyrone Matthews i

06/08/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of Proposed Order Re Motion for Leave to File Complaint-In-Intervention; Motion for Leave to File Complaint-In-Intervention; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Tyrone Matthews in Support of

Declaration of Counsel Re Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention

06/08/2021: Declaration of Counsel Re Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention

06/08/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Leave to File Complaint-in-Intervention

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Order to Advance Trial Setting Conference; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Continuance of Hearing or Case Management-Stipulation and Order-Service by Posting or Publication; Amount: $20.00; Paid: $20.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9973 Receipt No.: 20211026-00146.1; Paid: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *9973 Receipt No.: 20211026-00146.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Stipulation and Order to Advance Trial Setting Conference; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Stipulation and Order to Advance Trial Setting Conference; Confidential: YES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Statutory Workers' Compensation Lien; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALFRED BROYLES, JR; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALFRED BROYLES, JR; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/01/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4447 Receipt No.: 20210201-00468.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of ALFRED BROYLES, JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KHS&S CONTRACTORS is a litigant

Latest cases where KEENAN HOPKINS SUDER & STOWELL CONTRACTORS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where W.G.YATES & SONS CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where MOOREFIELD CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant