This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/30/2023 at 16:02:47 (UTC).

BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION vs DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2023 BROWN STRAUSS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel Bustamante. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1502

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Manuel Bustamante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

CRUM AND FORSTER INSURANCE COMPANY, A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

COLUMBIA STEEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILENE C. APANIAN

Defendant Attorney

JESSICA EHRLICH

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages

03/29/2023: Complaint for Damages

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/29/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/29/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

03/30/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

03/30/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Document Return.

05/18/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

05/19/2023: Notice of Document Return.

Notice and Acknowledgement and Receipt on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

05/19/2023: Notice and Acknowledgement and Receipt on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

05/22/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

06/01/2023: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

06/09/2023: Request for Dismissal

Defendant Desert Community College Districts General Denial to Plaintiffs Brown Strauss INCS Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

06/23/2023: Defendant Desert Community College Districts General Denial to Plaintiffs Brown Strauss INCS Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

07/05/2023: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

07/05/2023: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Judicial Officer: Manuel Bustamante; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230705-01591.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230705-01603.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Filed By: BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Filed By: BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/29/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230629-00546.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/29/2023; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20230629-00546.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Desert Community College Districts General Denial to Plaintiffs Brown Strauss INCS Complaint on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Filed By: DESERT COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/12/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230612-01225.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
05/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice and Acknowledgement and Receipt on Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Filed By: BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/30/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230330-00166.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/30/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230330-00166.1; Paid: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023

DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Real Property (Over $25,000) of BROWN STRAUSS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 07/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less