Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 03:52:18 (UTC).

BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC. vs RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RESNICK LOUIS, P C. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric V. Isaac. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0051

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric V. Isaac

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC

Defendants

RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C

LENA M. LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

02/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

02/05/2021: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

02/03/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Small Claims; Judicial Officer: Eric V. Isaac; Location/Courtroom: Department MV2; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.; Filed By: BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Small Claims) on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.; Filed By: BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Small Claims filing claim for more than $1,500 but less than or equal to $5,000 (CCP116.230B2); Amount: $50.00; Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/03/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4857 Receipt No.: 20210203-00070.1; Paid: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance on Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (SC-100) Over $1,500 up to $5,000; Filed By: BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketFilings: Plaintiff's Claim - Over $1,500 up to $5,000 filed by BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC.; Disposition: Request for Dismissal 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESNICK & LOUIS, P.C is a litigant

Latest cases where BOSCO LEGAL SERVICES, INC is a litigant