This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/16/2022 at 00:21:10 (UTC).

BONILLA vs GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 BONILLA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4957

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANA BONILLA

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAREY B. WOOD

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligation

11/14/2022: Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligation

Summons Issued and Filed

11/14/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

11/14/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

11/15/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

11/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

11/15/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221115-00084.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/15/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221115-00084.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/13/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ANA BONILLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ANA BONILLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ANA BONILLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligation; Filed By: ANA BONILLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANA BONILLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less