This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 05:27:04 (UTC).

BERBER vs RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 BERBER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3233

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALICIA BERBER

Defendant

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL JOSEPH KOLODZIEJ

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS JOHN WALSH

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

07/19/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

07/19/2021: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

07/19/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

07/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

07/20/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

07/20/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER

08/20/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER

Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER

10/18/2021: Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER by RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer as to Cause(s) of Action Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/19/2021; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20211019-00104.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint for Damages on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER; Filed By: ALICIA BERBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210720-00096.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALICIA BERBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALICIA BERBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000); Filed By: ALICIA BERBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALICIA BERBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ALICIA BERBER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.