This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2023 at 10:02:22 (UTC).

BENSON vs IZAGUIRRE

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 BENSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IZAGUIRRE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3388

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN BENSON

ANA BENSON

Defendant

JOSE IZAGUIRRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAN N NGUYEN

Defendant Attorney

JOHN S. LOWENTHAL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

07/25/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Request for Dismissal

07/25/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

07/05/2023: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b)) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

07/05/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b)) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b)

08/17/2023: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b)

Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

07/05/2023: Notice of Hearing (eFiling) on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Declaration Authorizing Payment

07/03/2023: Declaration Authorizing Payment

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

07/03/2023: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

05/22/2023: Proof of Service on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Certificate of Mailing

03/30/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/30/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Declaration of HOAN N NGUYEN, ESQ., RE: CMC/OSC RE: SANCTIONS

03/30/2023: Declaration of HOAN N NGUYEN, ESQ., RE: CMC/OSC RE: SANCTIONS

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

03/28/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

03/27/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

03/16/2023: Notice of Unavailability of Counsel

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

03/15/2023: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely Case Management Statement (CRC 3.725(a)).

02/09/2023: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely Case Management Statement (CRC 3.725(a)).

Certificate of Mailing

02/09/2023: Certificate of Mailing

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b) JOHN BENSON, ANA BENSON; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(b)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/25/2023; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: EFM20230725-01356.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Expire Fee Waivers; Expiration Date: 09/23/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: JOHN BENSON; ANA BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/05/2023; Fine Description: Fee waiver Receipt No.: EFM20230705-01371.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Unconditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(b)) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON; Filed By: ANA BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Granted by Clerk on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON; Filed By: JOHN BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: JOHN BENSON; ANA BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOHN BENSON; ANA BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOHN BENSON; ANA BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON; Filed By: ANA BENSON; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON; Filed By: JOHN BENSON; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOHN BENSON; ANA BENSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BENSON; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 07/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less