This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/19/2023 at 06:26:57 (UTC).

BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC. vs HCI, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 BEN'S ASPHALT MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HCI, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4822

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

MEDINA CONSTRUCTION

Defendants

PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

HCI, LLC

AT&T CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES, INC

FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENRY H KANG

Defendant Attorneys

JESSICA L. CLOUSE

JOEL R. VILLASENOR DONN S. TAKETA

 

Court Documents

Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company dba AT&T California's Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

02/14/2023: Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company dba AT&T California's Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL AND U.S. MAIL ON PROPOSED ORDER on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

01/27/2023: PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL AND U.S. MAIL ON PROPOSED ORDER on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Order Directing Service of Plaintiff's Complaint ON HCI, LLC by Secretary of State

02/07/2023: Order Directing Service of Plaintiff's Complaint ON HCI, LLC by Secretary of State

Answer by Frontier Communications Corporate Services, Inc. and Frontier California Inc. on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

01/20/2023: Answer by Frontier Communications Corporate Services, Inc. and Frontier California Inc. on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Notice of Document Return.

01/11/2023: Notice of Document Return.

DECLARATION OF HENRY KANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON HCI, LLC ON SECRETARY OF STATE [Code of Civ. Proc. 416.10]; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

01/11/2023: DECLARATION OF HENRY KANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON HCI, LLC ON SECRETARY OF STATE [Code of Civ. Proc. 416.10]; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON HCI, LLC ON SECRETARY OF STATE [Code of Civ. Proc. 416.10]; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN

01/11/2023: APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT ON HCI, LLC ON SECRETARY OF STATE [Code of Civ. Proc. 416.10]; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

01/13/2023: Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Order Extending Time to Serve on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/14/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

12/14/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

12/13/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

12/13/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

12/13/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

Notice of Document Return.

12/12/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Department Assignment

11/04/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

11/04/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

11/04/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/04/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/14/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230214-01179.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Pacific Bell Telephone Company dba AT&T California's Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.; Filed By: PACIFIC BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order Directing Service of Plaintiff's Complaint ON HCI, LLC by Secretary of State; Filed By: BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/31/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230131-00418.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL AND U.S. MAIL ON PROPOSED ORDER on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.; Filed By: BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230123-00700.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230123-00700.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/23/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230123-00700.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer by Frontier Communications Corporate Services, Inc. and Frontier California Inc. on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.; Filed By: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICES, INC.; FRONTIER CALIFORNIA, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/04/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221104-01915.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/04/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221104-01915.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint of Plaintiff Ben's Asphalt & Maintenance Company, Inc. DBA Medina Construction for Breach of Contract; Filed By: BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of BEN'S ASPHALT & MAINTENANCE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less