This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 00:23:17 (UTC).

BELLAMY vs FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 BELLAMY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5443

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENRY BELLAMY

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC

THE KROGER CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NINA SARGSYAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

12/01/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

12/01/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Summons Issued and Filed

11/30/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/30/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint- Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

11/30/2021: Complaint- Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/01/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211201-00198.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/29/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: HENRY BELLAMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: HENRY BELLAMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: HENRY BELLAMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint- Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death; Filed By: HENRY BELLAMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of HENRY BELLAMY, AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARGSYAN, NINA