This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/28/2021 at 01:50:23 (UTC).

BEAVOR vs LIN

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 BEAVOR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2545

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Minors

CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

ETHAN ROBERT BEAVOR

AIDEN DEAN-CASAS BEAVOR

Defendant

ANDREW LIN

Minors and Plaintiffs

ETHAN ROBERT BEAVOR

AIDEN DEAN-CASAS BEAVOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

Omid O Naimi

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial

05/24/2021: Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint-Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

05/24/2021: Complaint-Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

05/24/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

05/24/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

06/15/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

06/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

06/18/2021: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

Summons Issued and Filed

06/18/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

06/18/2021: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/15/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1036 Receipt No.: 20210615-00265.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Appl/Order for Appt of Guradian Ad Litem; Filed By: CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR; ETHAN ROBERT BEAVOR; AIDEN DEAN-CASAS BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR; ETHAN ROBERT BEAVOR; AIDEN DEAN-CASAS BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint-Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death; Filed By: CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR; ETHAN ROBERT BEAVOR; AIDEN DEAN-CASAS BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiff's Demand for Jury Trial; Filed By: CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR; ETHAN ROBERT BEAVOR; AIDEN DEAN-CASAS BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CAMELIA RAMIREZ BEAVOR

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAIMI OMID O.