This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 01:20:53 (UTC).

BEAUMONT MANOR LLC vs CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 BEAUMONT MANOR LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5864

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

HIGHLAND SPRINGS CARE CENTER

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elizabeth Plott Tyler

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

11/19/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

11/19/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

Summons Issued and Filed

11/18/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/18/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

11/18/2021: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/19/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20211119-00279.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/19/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1752 Receipt No.: 20211119-00275.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/17/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000); Filed By: BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of BEAUMONT MANOR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TYLER ELIZABETH P.