This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 15:36:39 (UTC).

BASURTO vs IMPORTADORA AUTOVENT

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 BASURTO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IMPORTADORA AUTOVENT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John W. Vineyard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0639

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

John W. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN BASURTO

GENISSE AGUILAR

CHRISTIAN VAZQUEZ

Defendants

IMPORTADORA AUTOVENT

DOE DRIVER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Derek Pakiz

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

02/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

02/09/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE-PERSONAL INJURY

02/09/2021: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE-PERSONAL INJURY

Notice of Department Assignment

02/16/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

02/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal

07/07/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

08/16/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: John W. Vineyard; Location/Courtroom: Department 7; Disposition: Hearing Off-Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: JOHN BASURTO; CHRISTIAN VAZQUEZ; GENISSE AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/16/2021; Fine Description: Check #271451 Receipt No.: 20210216-00181.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JOHN BASURTO; CHRISTIAN VAZQUEZ; GENISSE AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JOHN BASURTO; CHRISTIAN VAZQUEZ; GENISSE AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JOHN BASURTO; CHRISTIAN VAZQUEZ; GENISSE AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE-PERSONAL INJURY; Filed By: JOHN BASURTO; CHRISTIAN VAZQUEZ; GENISSE AGUILAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of JOHN BASURTO; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 07/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAKIZ J. DEREK ESQ.