This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/03/2023 at 13:42:15 (UTC).

BARRERAS vs FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 BARRERAS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell L. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0156

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Russell L. Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANGEL BARRERAS

YOLANDA BARRERAS

Defendants

FCA US, LLC

FINN AUTO GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIONNA GRACE DOLIN

Defendant Attorney

SPENCER P. HUGRET

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

11/18/2022: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

11/18/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

11/18/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

11/18/2022: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

11/18/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS

11/30/2022: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS

Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS

01/05/2023: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department 260

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230106-00040.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/06/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230106-00040.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS; Filed By: FCA US, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/30/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221130-01487.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS; Filed By: ANGEL BARRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221118-01519.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/18/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221118-01519.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ANGEL BARRERAS; YOLANDA BARRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ANGEL BARRERAS; YOLANDA BARRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ANGEL BARRERAS; YOLANDA BARRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: ANGEL BARRERAS; YOLANDA BARRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ANGEL BARRERAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURGRET SPENCER