This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/03/2021 at 00:11:33 (UTC).

BARNETT vs RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 BARNETT filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Harold W. Hopp. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1303

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Harold W. Hopp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OBRA BARNETT

Defendants

SUZANNE RODRIGUEZ

DARIO RODRIGUEZ

SUZANNE BERNETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Edward Yee

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

03/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

03/09/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

03/09/2021: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Department Assignment

03/17/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

03/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/10/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Certificate of Mailing

09/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

09/10/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g)

09/10/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g)

Declaration of James E. Yee re OSC hearing December 9, 2021

09/27/2021: Declaration of James E. Yee re OSC hearing December 9, 2021

Request for Dismissal

09/27/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g) as to James Edward Yee, OBRA BARNETT; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to James Edward Yee, OBRA BARNETT; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: OBRA BARNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of James E. Yee re OSC hearing December 9, 2021; Filed By: OBRA BARNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file request for entry of default of all defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(g)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 03/17/2021; Fine Description: Check #236 Receipt No.: 20210317-00351.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: OBRA BARNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: OBRA BARNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OBRA BARNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed By: OBRA BARNETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of OBRA BARNETT; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 09/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEE JAMES E.