This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 11:22:05 (UTC).

BAILARD vs DAWSON

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 BAILARD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DAWSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6095

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUDITH BAILARD

Defendant

CHATNEY DAWSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN L. MAZZA

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/06/2022: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

09/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

09/06/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Electronic Service

09/06/2022: Notice of Electronic Service

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

09/20/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

09/20/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

09/20/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220920-01738.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220920-01738.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/05/2022; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Electronic Service; Filed By: JUDITH BAILARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: JUDITH BAILARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: JUDITH BAILARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: JUDITH BAILARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000); Filed By: JUDITH BAILARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of JUDITH BAILARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAZZA STEVEN L. ESQ.