This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 09:03:49 (UTC).

B. vs DOE 1

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 B filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DOE 1. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is O.G. Magno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4292

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

O.G. Magno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D. B

D. H

Defendants

DOE 1

DOES 2 THROUGH 25

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLAKE J. WOODHALL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Sumons on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

01/25/2023: Proof of Service of Sumons on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

Notice of deposit of jury fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

01/23/2023: Notice of deposit of jury fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

First Amended Summons Issued and Filed

01/17/2023: First Amended Summons Issued and Filed

1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

01/17/2023: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

Order Sealing Certificate of Merit, Permitting Service on Doe Defendants, Permitting Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, and Permitting Plaintiff to Proceed under Fictitious Name

01/05/2023: Order Sealing Certificate of Merit, Permitting Service on Doe Defendants, Permitting Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, and Permitting Plaintiff to Proceed under Fictitious Name

Certificate of Mailing

01/05/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Ex Parte Application

01/05/2023: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Ex Parte Application

Declaration of Blake Woodhall in Support of Ex Parte Application

12/29/2022: Declaration of Blake Woodhall in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Lodging Documents on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

12/28/2022: Notice of Lodging Documents on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

Ex Parte Application to Seal Certificate of Merit on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

12/28/2022: Ex Parte Application to Seal Certificate of Merit on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.

Notice of Document Return.

12/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

12/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

12/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

12/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

12/28/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Department Assignment

10/10/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

10/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

Certificate of Counsel.

10/06/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/27/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230127-01768.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Sumons on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230124-00089.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/24/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230124-00089.1; Paid: $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of deposit of jury fees on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.; Filed By: D. B.; D. H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/18/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230118-00571.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint re 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.; Expiration Date: 03/18/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.; Filed By: D. H.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: First Amended Summons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Ex Parte Application to Seal Certificate of Merit on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Lodging Documents on Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000) of D. B.; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/10/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221010-00925.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/10/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20221010-00925.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death Tort (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Damages; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: D. B.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less