This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2021 at 15:17:38 (UTC).

AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION vs BLANCHARD

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BLANCHARD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marie E. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7715

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Marie E. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendants

GARY C BLANCHARD

DENISE N NELSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANIEL MEDIONI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

09/13/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Notice of Department Assignment

09/13/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

09/09/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/09/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

09/09/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

09/09/2021: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Marie E. Wood; Location/Courtroom: Department S102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/13/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210913-00139.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 11/08/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000); Filed By: AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUDIE MURPHY RANCH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M