This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 05:45:41 (UTC).

ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION vs R&R LOGISTICS AND FULFILLMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against R R LOGISTICS AND FULFILLMENT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3266

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

R&R LOGISTICS AND FULFILLMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JAY SOLANKI

RISHI DHURANDHAR

RICHARD UBALLEZ

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

J & RR LOGISTICS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MEEGHAN HENRY TIRTASAPUTRA

JASON ROBERT FAIR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Document Return.

02/22/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110) Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/28/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110) Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/27/2022: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

01/14/2022: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

Certificate of Mailing

01/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

01/14/2022: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Declaration

01/04/2022: Declaration

Summary of Case in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Default Judgment by Court on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/04/2022: Summary of Case in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Default Judgment by Court on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/04/2022: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

01/04/2022: Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Nargess N. Hadjian in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Judgment by Court

01/04/2022: Declaration of Nargess N. Hadjian in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Judgment by Court

Declaration of Nargess N. Hadjian in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Separate Judgment

01/04/2022: Declaration of Nargess N. Hadjian in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Separate Judgment

Declaration of Anish Patel in Lieu of Live Testimony in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Judgment by Court

01/04/2022: Declaration of Anish Patel in Lieu of Live Testimony in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studios, Inc.s Application for Judgment by Court

Application for Separate Judgment Against Defaulted Defendants Pursuant to CCP 579 in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studio, Inc.s Application for Default Judgment by Court on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTE

01/04/2022: Application for Separate Judgment Against Defaulted Defendants Pursuant to CCP 579 in Support of Plaintiff Ashtel Studio, Inc.s Application for Default Judgment by Court on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered) Request for Entry of Default on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/04/2022: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered) Request for Entry of Default on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Notice of Document Return.

01/05/2022: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/03/2022: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

01/03/2022: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: why sanctions not to exceed $1500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to timely file proof of service on complaint pursuant to CRC 3.110(b & f) as to Does 1-50 as to JASON ROBERT FAIR, ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/28/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220128-00216.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110) Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on 1st Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Filed By: ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Filed By: ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/22/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210722-00021.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000); Filed By: ASHTEL STUDIOS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R&R LOGISTICS AND FULLFILLMENT, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAIR JASON R.