This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/09/2021 at 08:35:33 (UTC).

ARELLANES vs RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 ARELLANES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2034

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERNIE D ARELLANES

Defendant

RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blair J Berkley

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS J WALSH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

05/05/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

05/05/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued and Filed

04/28/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

04/28/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

04/28/2021: Complaint

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

06/10/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

08/02/2021: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

Defendant Riverside Community College District's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

08/26/2021: Defendant Riverside Community College District's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/27/2021; Fine Description: Exempt Receipt No.: EFM20210827-00262.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Riverside Community College District's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES; Filed By: RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES; Filed By: ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Employment (Over $25,000) of ERNIE D ARELLANES; Filed By: ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 05/05/2021; Fine Description: Check #19368 Receipt No.: 20210505-00610.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint; Filed By: ERNIE D ARELLANES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH DENNIS J. ESQ.