Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 16:48:59 (UTC).

APARICIO vs KATZ

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 APARICIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KATZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0631

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERONICA VARGAS APARICIO

Defendant

MICHAEL KATZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry Rulsky

Rulsky Law Group

Attorney at Rulsky Law Group

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

05/19/2021: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

04/14/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

04/14/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

Notice of Department Assignment

02/08/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of

02/04/2021: Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/04/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

02/04/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

02/04/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service as to Rulsky Law Group, VERONICA VARGAS APARICIO; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS4; Disposition: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Hearing on Order to Show Cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 02/08/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *1018 Receipt No.: 20210208-00035.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: VERONICA VARGAS APARICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: VERONICA VARGAS APARICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: VERONICA VARGAS APARICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of; Filed By: VERONICA VARGAS APARICIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Under $10,000) of TBD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RULSKY JERRY