This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 09:09:29 (UTC).

ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY vs BAKER TILLY US, LLP

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BAKER TILLY US, LLP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kira L. Klatchko and O.G. Magno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3605

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kira L. Klatchko

O.G. Magno

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MIYA LIGHTHOUSE PS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY AND ON BEHALF OF THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

Defendants

BAKER TILLY US, LLP

SAXE ROTH DOKOVNA SCHWARTZ & LYNSKEY CPAS

COHEN TAX & CONSULTING, INC

THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

SQUAR MILNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP (

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AUSTIN LEGAL GROUP

Defendant Attorneys

SPACH, CAPALDI & WAGGAMAN, LLP

Attorney at SPACH, CAPALDI & WAGGAMAN, LLP

CHAPMAN, GLUCKSMAN, DEAN & ROEB

Attorney at CHAPMAN, GLUCKSMAN, DEAN & ROEB

RESNICK & LOUIS, PC

Attorney at RESNICK & LOUIS, PC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

03/23/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment to Department

Certificate of Mailing

03/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/23/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/22/2023: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Certificate of Mailing

03/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/22/2023: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/22/2023: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Certificate of Mailing

03/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY by BAKER TILLY US, LLP, SQUAR MILNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP (

03/22/2023: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY by BAKER TILLY US, LLP, SQUAR MILNER, LLP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP (

Certificate of Mailing

03/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/21/2023: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/21/2023: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Defendants Baker Tilly US, LLP and Squar Milner LLP on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC,

03/15/2023: Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Strike Punitive Damages Allegations of Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Defendants Baker Tilly US, LLP and Squar Milner LLP on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

03/14/2023: Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

Notice of Document Quality Assurance

03/13/2023: Notice of Document Quality Assurance

Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/08/2023: Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/08/2023: Proof of Service by Electronic Service (non-complaint) of on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice of Ruling re: Demurrer on First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

03/08/2023: Notice of Ruling re: Demurrer on First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to; Judicial Officer: Kira Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: O.G. Magno; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Kira Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Kira Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Demurrer on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Kira Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Strike Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000) of ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Kira Klatchko; Location/Courtroom: Department PS1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
152 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Related Case; Filed By: ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; MIYA LIGHTHOUSE PS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY AND ON BEHALF OF THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220914-00774.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/14/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220914-00774.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Fraud (Over $25,000); Filed By: ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; MIYA LIGHTHOUSE PS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY AND ON BEHALF OF THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; MIYA LIGHTHOUSE PS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY AND ON BEHALF OF THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; MIYA LIGHTHOUSE PS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY AND ON BEHALF OF THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ANE HOLDINGS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; MIYA LIGHTHOUSE PS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, INDIVIDUALLY AND DERIVATIVELY AND ON BEHALF OF THE LIGHTHOUSE PALM SPRINGS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less