This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 11:19:24 (UTC).

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC vs KEATING

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KEATING. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3828

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

GM FINANCIAL

Defendant

OLGA KEATING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Eugene Ernest

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Steven E Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 2984.4

08/11/2021: Declaration of Steven E Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 2984.4

Complaint for Possession of Personal Property; Breach of Contract and Damages; Common Counts

08/11/2021: Complaint for Possession of Personal Property; Breach of Contract and Damages; Common Counts

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

08/11/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Summons Issued and Filed

08/11/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Department Assignment

08/24/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Case Management Conference

08/24/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

10/12/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

10/12/2021: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Application for Writ of Possession on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

09/29/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Application for Writ of Possession on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Application for Writ of Possession Claim and Delivery (CD-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

09/29/2021: Application for Writ of Possession Claim and Delivery (CD-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

Declaration of Timothy January in Support of Application for Writ of Possession

09/29/2021: Declaration of Timothy January in Support of Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing Claim and Delivery (CD-110)

09/29/2021: Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing Claim and Delivery (CD-110)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Notice of Application for Writ of Possession - Claim and Delivery by AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions not to exceed $1,500 or dismissal should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Motion, application (including ex parte) or any other paper requiring a hearing subsequent to the first paper filing (70617A); Amount: $60.00; Paid: $60.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/29/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20210929-00479.1; Paid: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Application for Writ of Possession on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application for Writ of Possession Claim and Delivery (CD-100) on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Timothy January in Support of Application for Writ of Possession; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing Claim and Delivery (CD-110); Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/24/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *0958 Receipt No.: 20210824-00418.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Possession of Personal Property; Breach of Contract and Damages; Common Counts; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Steven E Ernest re: Venue Pursuant to California Civil Code 2984.4; Filed By: AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GM FINANCIAL DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICREDIT FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ERNEST STEVEN E