This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 01:53:04 (UTC).

ALTURA CREDIT UNION vs ROBERTSON

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 ALTURA CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERTSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6267

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALTURA CREDIT UNION

Defendant

BUDDY ROBERTSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT JAMES COLCLOUGH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of ALTURA CREDIT UNION

11/18/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of ALTURA CREDIT UNION

Notice of Department Assignment

11/18/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Summons Issued and Filed

11/15/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

11/15/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000)

11/15/2021: Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Location/Courtroom: Department C1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/18/2021; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20211118-00415.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) on Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of ALTURA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 01/14/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALTURA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALTURA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALTURA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000); Filed By: ALTURA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Collections (Under $10,000) of ALTURA CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTURA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLCLOUGH ROBERT JAMES