This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 00:59:51 (UTC).

ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION vs DACOLIAS

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DACOLIAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric A Keen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0043

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eric A Keen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION

Defendants

MICHAEL J. DACOLIAS

MICHAEL DACOLIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARDEN D. BURSTEIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint for (1) Claim and Delivery of Personal Property, for Pre-Trial Writ of Possession, and Order directing Transfer of Personal Property and Restraining Order, and (2) Money Due on a Contract

01/03/2023: Complaint for (1) Claim and Delivery of Personal Property, for Pre-Trial Writ of Possession, and Order directing Transfer of Personal Property and Restraining Order, and (2) Money Due on a Contract

Summons Issued and Filed

01/03/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/03/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

01/03/2023: Certificate of Counsel.

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000)

01/05/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

01/05/2023: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • HearingType: Hearing on Notice of Application for Writ of Possession - Claim and Delivery; Judicial Officer: Eric A Keen; Location/Courtroom: Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230105-01626.1; Paid: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/05/2023; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20230105-01626.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 03/04/2023; Status: Active

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for (1) Claim and Delivery of Personal Property, for Pre-Trial Writ of Possession, and Order directing Transfer of Personal Property and Restraining Order, and (2) Money Due on a Contract; Filed By: ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Collections (Over $25,000) of ALLY BANK, A CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less