This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 01:28:01 (UTC).

ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC vs BONNER

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BONNER. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5452

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

CARL TERZIAN

Defendant

LIONEL BONNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Easton Sayer

 

Court Documents

Notice of Department Assignment

10/26/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

10/26/2021: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

Summons Issued and Filed

10/05/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Certificate of Counsel.

10/05/2021: Certificate of Counsel.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/05/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

10/05/2021: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3402 Receipt No.: 20211026-00753.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/26/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *3402 Receipt No.: 20211026-00750.1; Paid: $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 12/04/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000; Filed By: ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $10,000 does not exceed $25,000) of ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALISTS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLTRA FRESH CLEANING SPECIALIST INC is a litigant