This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/12/2022 at 00:24:57 (UTC).

ALLEN vs AKBAR

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 ALLEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AKBAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1367

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLTON ALLEN

Defendants

MOHAMMED KHALID AKBAR

PRESTIGE AUTOS

MECHANICS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARON E. GLASSEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint 1. Breach of Contract

04/06/2022: Complaint 1. Breach of Contract

Summons Issued and Filed

04/06/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/06/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

04/06/2022: Certificate of Counsel.

Plaintiffs Election to Receive Service Exclusively by Electronic Means

04/06/2022: Plaintiffs Election to Receive Service Exclusively by Electronic Means

Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

04/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

Notice of Department Assignment

04/11/2022: Notice of Department Assignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Location/Courtroom: Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220411-00554.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eFiling; Amount: $1.00; Paid: $1.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 04/11/2022; Fine Description: EFiling Payment Receipt No.: EFM20220411-00554.1; Paid: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Non-Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Expiration Date: 06/05/2022; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Plaintiffs Election to Receive Service Exclusively by Electronic Means; Filed By: CARLTON ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CARLTON ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CARLTON ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CARLTON ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint 1. Breach of Contract; Filed By: CARLTON ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Breach of Contract/Warranty (Over $25,000) of CARLTON ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRESTIGE AUTOS is a litigant

Latest cases where MECHANICS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSEY SHARON