This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 10:52:00 (UTC).

ZAPOT VS SPRUCE GROVE INC

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 ZAPOT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SPRUCE GROVE INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0362

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PABLO ZAPOT

Defendants

SOUTH COAST WINERYINC

SPRUCE GROVE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAXTER LAW

27851 Bradley Rd., Ste. 145

Menifee, CA 92586

Defendant Attorney

NEWMEYER & DILLIONLLP

895 Dove Street Fifth Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2017 OF PABLO ZAPOT AS TO SOUTH COAST WINERYINC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 04/25/17

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO VERI

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT BY PABLO ZAPOT FILED

DECLARATION OF NANCYROSE HERNA

DECLARATION OF NANCYROSE HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER FILED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDERS RE: CONTINUANCE OF 7/18/17 HRGS.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PABLO ZAPOT SERVED ON SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC FILED; DATE OF MAILING 08/15/17

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLA

DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PABLO ZAPOT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC REPRESENTED BY NEWMEYER & DILLIONLLP FILED.

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE CERTAIN P

MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY PABLO ZAPOT FILED

DECLARATION OF NANCYROSE HERNA

DECLARATION OF NANCYROSE HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY PABL

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER BY PABLO ZAPOT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION/DEMURRER/DECLARATION SERVED ON MICHAEL J STUDENKA SERVED 10/09/17 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CA

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON NEWMEYER& DILLON, LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/20/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PABLO ZAPOT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PABLO ZAPOT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC; Disposition: Sustained

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PABLO ZAPOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ON NEWMEYER& DILLON, LLP WITH A MAILING DATE OF 11/20/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON CONTINUANCE - MOTION FOR DEMURRER - RES70995.; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: CONTINUANCE - MOTION TO STRIKE - RES70996; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: DEMURRER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PABLO ZAPOT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SPRUCE GROVE INC, SOUTH COAST WINERYINC; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: NOTICE AND AKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT SUBMITTED BY PABLO ZAPOT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR PABLO ZAPOT WAS GRANTED FOR COMPLAINT; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY PABLO ZAPOT IS GRA; CLERK P.THIPHAVONG (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY PABLO ZAPOT (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/04/2017 OF PABLO ZAPOT AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/09/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less