Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/06/2018 at 12:52:23 (UTC).

ZAMBRANO & BARGAS ZAMBRANO

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 ZAMBRANO BARGAS ZAMBRANO was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3561

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO

Riverside, CA 92505

Respondent

ARELIS S BARGAS ZAMBRANO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FOR DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 09/06/2017 OF VICTOR ZAMBRANO WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AFTER HEARING FILED BY VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO: HONORABLE COMMISSIONER ERIC V. ISAAC (FW-008).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING RE: ELIGIBILITY OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO.; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED; VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO TO PAY $450.00 WITHIN 10 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THE ORDER. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • HEARING RE: ELIGIBILITY OF WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS SET 10/10/17 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. F502.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES FILED (FW-007).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER FILED BY VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO (FW-006).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • FEE WAIVER DENIED-PAY WITHIN 10 DAYS SET 9/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWRF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO IS DEN; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER ERIC V. ISAAC (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT DATE RE: PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 11/06/17 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED - DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN) FILED 09/06/2017 OF VICTOR ZAMBRANO (FL-110/FL-210/FL-510)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DECLARATION OF RESIDENCE FILED BY VICTOR Y ZAMBRANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • FAMILY LAW PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: FAILURE TO BRING CASE TO TRIAL/JUDGMENT SET 9/05/22 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. CLER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: NON PROOF OF SERVICE SET ON 9/07/20 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DATE OF MARRIAGE (PETITIONER): 05/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DATE OF SEPARATION (PETITIONER): 09/02/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • PETITION FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • PETITIONER'S PLACE OF RESIDENCE RIVERSIDE, 92505

    Read MoreRead Less