This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/01/2016 at 10:46:28 (UTC).

YU VS SEGARRA

Case Summary

On 07/08/2014 YU filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEGARRA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1532

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM YU

Defendants

PHIL SEGARRA III

Murrieta, CA 92563

MERANCIANA LOPEZ

Murrieta, CA 92563

PHIL MAGANA SEGARRA

Other

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2014 OF WILLIAM YU BY PHIL SEGARRA III, MERANCIANA LOPEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY PHIL SEGARRA III IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MERANCIANA LOPEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK J PRENDERGAST (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON WILLIAM YU WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/25/14 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2014 OF WILLIAM YU AS TO PHIL MAGANA SEGARRA; MAILING DATE OF 07/19/14 FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2014 OF WILLIAM YU AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 07/19/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2014 OF WILLIAM YU AS TO PHIL MAGANA SEGARRA, ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 07/08/2014 OF WILLIAM YU AS TO PHIL SEGARRA III; MAILING DATE OF 07/19/14 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/22/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/29/14 T1 JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE).

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/05/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2014
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/05/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: COMPLIANCE/ DISMISSAL AS TO PHIL MAGANA SEGARRA, PHIL SEGARRA III, MERANCIANA LOPEZ.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/29/14 T1 JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: COMPLIANCE/ DISMISSAL AS TO PHIL MAGANA SEGARRA, PHIL SEGARRA III, MERANCIANA LOPEZ.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 08/22/14 T1 COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • JUDGMENT BY STIPULATION LODGED BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - TEMECULA.; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 8/22/14, AT 8:00, IN DEPT T1

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER JOAN F BURGESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR POSTING/PUBLICATION (SUMMONS) BY WILLIAM YU.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 9/08/14 AT 8:00 IN TCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less