This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/06/2020 at 04:44:54 (UTC).

YOUNESI DDS VS CECCHINI DDS

Case Summary

On 01/22/2009 YOUNESI DDS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CECCHINI DDS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN G EVANS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3467

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOHN G EVANS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

PALM DESERT DENTALSERVICES

UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC

DR JAMES CECCHINI

HAMID YOUNESI DDS

SHAFA DENTAL CORPORATION

Defendants and Plaintiffs

JAMES J CECCHINI DDS

UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC

H YOUNESI DDS INC

HAMID YOUNESI DDS

PALM DESERT DENTALCENTER

Not Classified By Court

CONSOLIDATED CASE INS090275

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KADE, MICHAEL P.

Defendant Attorney

HARLOW, SCOTT N.

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY HAMI

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY HAMID YOUNESI DDS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2009 OF HAMID YOUNESI DDS SERVED ON JAMES J CECCHINI DDS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/14/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2009 OF HAMID YOUNESI DDS AS TO JAMES J CECCHINI DDS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/14/09.

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FI

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2009 OF HAMID YOUNESI DDS BY JAMES J CECCHINI DDS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED.

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FI

GENERAL DENIAL TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2009 OF HAMID YOUNESI DDS BY UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY SCOTT N. HARLOW FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2009 OF HAMID YOUNESI DDS SERVED ON UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/21/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DECLARATION OF I/S OF MOTION F

DECLARATION OF I/S OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION FILED

NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE BY CLERK

NOTICE TO CONSOLIDATE BY CLERK.

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADIN

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS BY UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FI

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC SERVED ON H YOUNESI DDS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/06/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC SERVED ON PALM DESERT DENTALCENTER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/06/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC AS TO PALM DESERT DENTALCENTER FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE 1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC AS TO H YOUNESI DDS INC FILED.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • DocketCASE REMANDED BACK TO SMALL CLAIMS CASE INS090275

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketNUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2009
  • DocketNUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 7/28/09 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 1C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE REMAND OF SMALL CLAIMS CASE INS090275 TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT BY HAMID YOUNESI DDS, SHAFA DENTAL CORPORATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2009
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUBMITTED BY HAMID YOUNESI DDS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Remanded to Municipal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT IN CONSOLIDATED SMALL CLAIMS CASE BY HAMID YOUNESI DDS, SHAFA DENTAL CORPORATION; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2009
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE MOTION TO VACATE THE DISMISSAL.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/22/2009 OF HAMID YOUNESI DDS SERVED ON JAMES J CECCHINI DDS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/14/09 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY H YOUNESI DDS INC, PALM DESERT DENTALCENTER FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY HAMID YOUNESI DDS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2009
  • Docket1ST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF UNITED DENTAL SERVICES INC FILED (AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # INS090275 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2009
  • DocketREJECTED DOCUMENT: CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL SUBMITTED BY HAMID YOUNESI DDS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less