This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/06/2018 at 21:00:11 (UTC).

WORLDWIDE ASSET VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 02/27/2009 WORLDWIDE ASSET filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4624

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

Defendant

KRISTINA SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CLARK, RORY W.

30699 Russell Ranch Road Ste 215

Westlake Village, CA 91362-7315

LAW OFFICE OF RORYW CLARK

14900 Magnolia Blvd 55997

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF LAW OFFICE OF RORY W CLARK FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (ENTIRE AC

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC FILED.

STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY

STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTERES

DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $587.17 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AS TO KRISTINA SANCHEZ FILED.

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMO

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY PURSUANT TO CCP 585 FILED.

DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTOR

DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES & INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% & ELECTION TO PROCEED PUR TO ACCOUNT STATED FILED

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT

DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AS TO KRISTINA SANCHEZ; MAILING DATE OF 09/04/09 FILED.

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 26

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL CO

LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (C

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF LAW OFFICE OF RORY W CLARK FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2010
  • HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT (ENTIRE ACTION) FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE SARAH A CHRISTIAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $587.17 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND COURT JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AS TO KRISTINA SANCHEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AS TO KRISTINA SANCHEZ (SINGLE DEFENDANT ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES & INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% & ELECTION TO PROCEED PUR TO ACCOUNT STATED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE COSTS PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033 FILED BY WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AS TO KRISTINA SANCHEZ; MAILING DATE OF 09/04/09 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED (COLLECTION) (BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260 (COLLECTION) - BLYTHE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL-GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT FOR COLLECTION UNDER $10,000 CRC 3.740 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • HEARING RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET 2/26/10 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. 260.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (COLLECTION - BLYTHE) FILED 02/27/2009 OF WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLDWIDE ASSET PURCHASING II L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLARK, RORY W.