This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/30/2018 at 09:45:38 (UTC).

WOODWARD VS OLEARNICK

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 WOODWARD filed an Other lawsuit against OLEARNICK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Blythe Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0180

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Blythe Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSHUA MATTHEW WOODWARD

Respondent

JEROME OLEARNICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ROBIN SAX

287 S Robertson Blvd., #375

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO/FOR RESPONDENTS NOTI

MOTION TO/FOR RESPONDENTS NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING BY JEROME OLEARNICK FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VACA

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VACATING NOVEMBER 17 2017 ORDER & QUASHING SERVICE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE BURKE E STRUNSKY.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/23/18.

ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF

ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS BY PLAINTIFF; HONORABLE JUDGE BURKE E STRUNSKY.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS.

LIMITED CIVIL - PETITION UNDER

LIMITED CIVIL - PETITION UNDER $10,000 FILED. (BLYTHE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DE

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 09/22/17.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON TH

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL ON THE PETITION FILED 08/15/2017 OF JOSHUA WOODWARD SERVED ON JEROME OLEARNICK FILED; DATE OF MAILING 08/10/17

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • OSC HEARING RE: FAILURE TO SERVE AS TO JOSHUA MATTHEW WOODWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/23/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR RESPONDENTS NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING BY JEROME OLEARNICK; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR VACATING NOVEMBER 17 2017 ORDER & QUASHING SERVICE IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE BURKE E STRUNSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • POS UNTIMELY - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ON CALENDAR 02/23/18 IS UNTIMELY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO/FOR RESPONDENTS NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING BY JEROME OLEARNICK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING - BLYTHE; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS BY PLAINTIFF; HONORABLE JUDGE BURKE E STRUNSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AS TO JOSHUA MATTHEW WOODWARD.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: OSC/PRA/PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED BY JOSHUA MATTHEW WOODWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL SUBMITTED BY JOSHUA MATTHEW WOODWARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 09/22/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS BY JOSHUA MATTHEW WOODWARD; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • NO POS - NO PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCLOSURE OF PUBLIC RECORDS ON CALENDAR 09/22/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/17/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92225.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • PETITION ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 260. (BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - PETITION UNDER $10,000 FILED. (BLYTHE)

    Read MoreRead Less