This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 21:43:38 (UTC).

WOODS VS LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2010 WOODS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9326

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RITA RUBIO

VICKI PETERSEN

LLOYDE MAYER

NANCY MAYER

AGUSTIN GARCIA

PAMELA HARTMAN

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LENNAR SALES CORPRATION

URBAN CONCRETE

MARSHALL INSTALLATION & WEATHERSTRIP INC

GOLDEN STATE FENCECO

CROWTHER PRENTISS CORPORATION

PACIFIC WINDOWS

FENCEWORKS INC

QUALITY PLASTERINGINC

SIGNATURE INTERIORS INC

D.L. LONG LANDSCAPING INC

EAGLE TILE INC

REGAL CULTURED MARBLE INC

PETERSEN-DEAN INC

HARDWOOD CREATIONS

99 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON & KRIGER

4887 E. La Palma Ave., #708

Anaheim, CA 92807

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont #300

Irvine, CA 92612

PRENOVOST NORMANDIN BERGH & DAWE

2122 North Broadway Suite 200

Santa Ana, CA 92706-2614

STUTZ, ARTIANO, SHINOFF & HOLTZ

43513 Ridge Park Drive

Temecula, CA 92590

LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER

20201 S.W. Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

OSMAN & ASSOCIATES

1980 Orange Tree Lane Suite 106

Redlands, CA 92374

BRAGG & KULUVA

610 West Ash Street Suite 1105

San Diego, CA 92101

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF LAWRENCE M BUREK

550 North Parkcenter Drive Suite 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

HINES SMITH CARDERDINCEL BLAND

3090 Bristol St #300

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP

811 Wilshire Blvd #975

Los Angeles, CA 90017

LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

650 Town Center Drive Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

BOHL, NIXON & SCHONEMAN

2300 Knol; Dr. Suite N

Ventura, CA 93003

MARSHALL, FRENCH & DEGRAVE

17901 Von Karman Ave. Ste 300

Irvine, CA 92614-7235

MORROW & WHITE

535 Anton Blvd Suite 1150

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN PEGAN

One Macarthur Place Suite 650

Santa Ana, CA 92707

BREMER WHYTE BROWN& O'MEARA LLP

20320 S.W. Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

LAW OFFICES OF ADRIENNE D COHEN

1551 N Tustin Ave #750

Santa Ana, CA 92705

SCHAFFER, LAX, MCNAUGHTON & CHEN

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HORTON OBERRECHT KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

2030 Main Street Suite-250

Irvine, CA 92614

HAMMONS & BALDINO LLP

2601 Airport Drive Ste 105

Torrance, CA 90505

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS FILED

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS SERVED ON LENNAR SALES CORPRATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/20/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS SERVED ON LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/20/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS AS TO PLAINTIFF THOMAS WOODS, LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS AS TO PLAINTIFF PAUL HARTMAN, PAMELA HARTMAN FILED

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FO

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING PRE-LITIGATION PROCEDURES

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER AN

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER ANSWER CROSS COMPLAINT AND ROE AMENDMENT TO BE FILED BY LENNAR HOMES SAL

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC NAMING ROES/MOES 01 TO BE 3 WAY CONSTRUCTIONINC FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC, LENNAR SALES CORPRATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LENNAR HOME

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC, LENNAR SALES CORPRATION REPRESENTED BY GREEN & HALL LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AND FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC, LENNAR SALES CORPRATION

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC BY BONANZA PLUMBING INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF CRAIG J SILVER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC BY LASCO BATHWARE INC REPRESENTED BY LEWIS, BRISBOIS, BISGAARD & SMITH LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC BY WALTER'S WHOLESALEELECTRIC REPRESENTED BY JACKS & MAYBAUM LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO BOURNE DEVELOPMENT, CASA DE OAK, CHARMAC INC, CLARK GRADING, EAGLE TILE INC, EXECUTIVE PLUMBINGINC, GAYTON BROTHERS PAINTING, GUTZMANN MASONRY FILED.

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/22/2011 OF GATEWAY INSULATIONINC AS TO MOES 1 THRU 100 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/22/2011 OF GATEWAY INSULATIONINC AS TO MOES 1 THRU 100 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF CAPITAL DRYWALL INC AS TO MOES 1 THROUGH 100 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/25/2011 OF GATEWAY PLASTERINGINC AS TO MOES 1 THROUGH 100 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2011 OF HIGH GRADE FORM INC AS TO MOES 1 THRU 100 SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/27/2011 OF URBAN CONCRETE AS TO LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC, LENNAR SALES CORPRATION SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/30/2011 OF BERNER ELECTRIC INC AS TO LENNAR SALES CORPRATION SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2011 OF LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC AS TO GATEWAY INSULATIONINC SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 01/23/14; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY HIGH GRADE FORM INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES IN DEPT. 06 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
359 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2010
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC, LENNAR SALES CORPRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS AS TO PLAINTIFF THOMAS WOODS, LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS SERVED ON LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/20/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS SERVED ON LENNAR SALES CORPRATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 10/20/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FEE PAID ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/29/2010 OF THOMAS WOODS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 12/28/10 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARDWOOD CREATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where EAGLE TILE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN CONCRETE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SIGNATURE INTERIORS, INC. is a litigant