This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 04:28:58 (UTC).

WONG vs LI

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 WONG filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against LI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad Firetag. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1536

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chad Firetag

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARIAH MEI WONG

Defendant

LU LI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE & ASSOCIATES Cindy Nguyet Tran

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

09/20/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

09/20/2021: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

Notice of Document Return.

09/17/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

09/14/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

Substitution of Attorney

06/28/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Document Return.

07/02/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Certificate of Mailing

05/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

05/19/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement

05/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Association of Counsel

03/24/2021: Notice of Association of Counsel

Answer to Verified Complaint by Defendant Lu Li on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

03/12/2021: Answer to Verified Complaint by Defendant Lu Li on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Dismiss by LU LI

03/03/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Dismiss by LU LI

Certificate of Mailing

02/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

02/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

02/16/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

Notice of Taking the Hearing for Motion to Dismiss off Calendar

02/16/2021: Notice of Taking the Hearing for Motion to Dismiss off Calendar

Proof of Service re: Conformed Copy of the Verified First Amended Complaint

02/10/2021: Proof of Service re: Conformed Copy of the Verified First Amended Complaint

Motion to Dismiss on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

01/22/2021: Motion to Dismiss on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing on Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement Pursuant to CRC 3.1385(c); Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/20/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *4379 Receipt No.: 20210920-00991.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385(c))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case (CM-200)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on 1st Amended Complaint SARIAH MEI WONG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for; Judicial Officer: Chad Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department 3; Disposition: Taken off calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Substitution of Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Court Reporter Fee Under 1 Hour; Amount: $30.00; Paid: $30.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/09/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2000 Receipt No.: CV200909-0105-OR.1; Paid: $30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/09/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2000 Receipt No.: CV200909-0104-OR.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Demurrer to Complaint of WONG by LU LI represented by CEO LAW INC filed. (Over $25,000); Filed By: LU LI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of WONG as to LU LI; mailing date of 07/15/20 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/12/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #7696 Receipt No.: CV200612-0054-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of WONG and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPT ASSIGMENT AND NOTICE OF CMC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 91752.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less