This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 17:53:15 (UTC).

WN INDIO; ET AL VS CITY OF INDIO; ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/17/2006 WN INDIO filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF INDIO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3108

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Respondents

450-460 NORTH PALMDRIVE LLC

WN INDIO LLC

INDIO CITIZENS FORSMARTGROWTH

LM2 INC

WEINTRAUB FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Plaintiff, Appellant and Petitioner

INDIO CITIZENS FORSMARTGROWTH

Interested Parties, Respondents, Defendants and Plaintiffs

LEONARD LUNDIN

ALJACKS RETAIL PARTNERS LP

LM2 INC

CITY OF INDIO

CITY OF INDIO REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY

ALL JCKS RETAIL PARTNERS I

450-460 NORTH PALMDRIVE LLC

WN INDIO LLC

WEINTRAUB FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

CITY OF INDIO CITYCOUNCIL

LUNDIN DEVELOPMENTCOMPANY

LEONARD H LUNDIN

LUNDIN DEVELOPMENT

ALJACKS RETAIL PARTNERS I

Not Classified By Court

INC063337 CONSOLIDATED PETITION FOR WRIT

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Defendant, Interested Party and Plaintiff Attorneys

WALLIN KRESS REISMAN & KRANITZ

2800 28Th Street Suite 315

Santa Monica, CA 90405

ALLEN MATKINS LECKGAMBLE & MALLORY

501 West Broadway #900

San Diego, CA 92101

BRIGGS LAW CORPORATION

99 East 'C' Street Suite 111

Upland, CA 91786

WOODRUFF SPRADLIN & SMART

555 Anton Blvd #1200

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

BREEN, PATRICK E.

515 South Figueroa Street Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3398

ALLEN MATKIKNS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS

515 South Figueroa Street Seventh Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

BRIGGS LAW CORPORATION

99 East 'C' Street Suite 111

Upland, CA 91786

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

PETITION FILED

PETITION FILED

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES (NOTICE TO COUNSEL)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON PETITION FILED 11/17/2006 OF WN INDIO LLC AS TO ALJACKS RETAIL PARTNERS LP; MAILING DATE OF 11/29/06 FILED.

NOTICE OF COURTS ORDER BY WN I

NOTICE OF COURTS ORDER BY WN INDIO LLC, 450-460 NORTH PALMDRIVE LLC, WEINTRAUB FINANCIALSERVICES INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON PETITION FILED 11/17/2006 OF WN INDIO LLC AS TO LEONARD H LUNDIN; MAILING DATE OF 12/06/06 FILED.

DECLARATION OF OF EMILY L MURR

DECLARATION OF OF EMILY L MURRAY IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MTN FOR CONSOLIDATION FILED

NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND CERTI

NOTICE OF COMPLETION AND CERTIFICATION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD BY CITY OF INDIO, CITY OF INDIO REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGAR

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER REGARDING MTN BY CITY OF INDIO, CITY OF INDIO REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY FILED.

STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED BY I

STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED BY INDIO CITIZENS FORSMARTGROWTH

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPO TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY LM2 INC/LEONARD LUNDIN DBA LUNDIN DEVELOPEMENT/ALJ.

NOTICE OF LODGING BY CITY OF I

NOTICE OF LODGING BY CITY OF INDIO, CITY OF INDIO CITYCOUNCIL, CITY OF INDIO REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF WOODRUFF SPRADLIN AND SMART FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

REPLY TO BRIEF IN SUPP OF PETI

REPLY TO BRIEF IN SUPP OF PETITITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY INDIO CITIZENS FORSMARTGROWTH FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) FIRST/SECOND/THIRD/FIFTH/SIXTH/SEVENTH/EIGHTH/NINT AS TO WN INDIO LLC, 450-460 NORTH PALMDRIVE LLC, WEINTRAUB FINANCIALSERVICES INC FILED.

ORDER FOR PETITION FOR WRIT OF

ORDER FOR PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE IS DENIED AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

FILED: REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE OF

FILED: REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT APP $135.00 RES $45.00 BY DEMETRIA KOTTER

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL CRTS OWN MTN CALENDAR090109 IS TAKEN OFF.

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF A

ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL THE CLERK OF CRT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE REMITTITUR.

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2017
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • DISMISSAL ENTERED NUNC PRO TUNC AS OF 10/15/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING OF DISMISSAL NUNC PRO TUNC IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEALS FILED RULING RESERVED W/DIRECTIONS JUSTICE RAMIREZ/MILLER/KING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL THE CLERK OF CRT IS DIRECTED TO ISSUE REMITTITUR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL CRTS OWN MTN CALENDAR090109 IS TAKEN OFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL #11 ADMIN.RECORD DEEMED ADMIN.RECORD ON APPEAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: RECEIPT ON APPEAL - AFFIDAVIT RECD BY RIV DCA ON 4/8/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT /RE MISSING DOCUMENT BY SUPERIOR COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE BY WN INDIO LLC (PLAINTIFF); HONORABLE JUDGE HAROLD W HOPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 11/22/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 2J - RESCHEDULED TO:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING SET 11/22/06 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 2G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2006
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: REASSIGNMENT AND/OR HEARING; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CALIF ATTY GENERAL OF COMM OF ACTION SEEKING WRIT OF MANDATE FOR VIOLATION OF CALIF ENV BY WN INDIO LLC, 450-460 NORTH PALMDRIVE LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD BY PETITIONERS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES (NOTICE TO COUNSEL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 450-460 NORTH PALMDRIVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEINTRAUB FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant