Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 19:45:09 (UTC).

WILSON VS MCGRATH

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 WILSON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCGRATH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0405

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAYMONDE Y WILSON

Banning, CA 92220

Defendant

MELANIE MCGRATH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

ANDERHOLT WHITTAKER LLP

73525 El Paseo Suite E-2516

Palm Desert, CA 92260

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY RAYMONDE Y WILSON IS DENIED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI (DENIED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Denied

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2015 OF RAYMONDE WILSON BY MELANIE MCGRATH REPRESENTED BY ANDERHOLT WHITTAKERLLP FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 11/09/2015 OF RAYMONDE WILSON SERVED ON MELANIE MCGRATH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 11/09/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

AMENDED FEE WAIVER FILED BY RA

AMENDED FEE WAIVER FILED BY RAYMONDE Y WILSON

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY RAYMONDE Y WILSON - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UD TRIAL.

ORDER FOR AMENDED COURT FEE WA

ORDER FOR AMENDED COURT FEE WAIVER IS GRANTED/RAYMONDE Y WILSON AND FILED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • NUNC PRO TUNC HEARING SET FOR 12/22/15 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • FWD HEARING SET FOR 11/30/15 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: FEE WAIVER GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR AMENDED COURT FEE WAIVER IS GRANTED/RAYMONDE Y WILSON AND FILED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2015
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 11/12/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWBA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 1/08/16 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY RAYMONDE Y WILSON (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less