This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/15/2018 at 09:09:07 (UTC).

WILCZAK VS DESERT RADIOLOGY

Case Summary

On 03/12/2004 WILCZAK filed an Other lawsuit against DESERT RADIOLOGY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1835

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEGGY A WILCZAK

EUGENE J WILCZAK

Defendants

DESERT HEART PHYSICIANS MEDICAL GROUP INC

VICKI J PORTNOFF MD

NARASIMHA P RAO MD

JOHN LEARY MD

DESERT RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP

TENET HEALTHSYSTEMDESERT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RONALD E HARRINGTON INC

The Muldoon Building 2Nd Floor 202 Newport Center Drive

Newport Beach, CA 92260

Defendant Attorneys

KRAMER DEBOER ENDELICATO & KEANE

74830 Highway 111 Suite 200

Indian Wells, CA 92210

BONNE, BRIDGES, MUELLER, OKEEFE & NICHOLS

3699 Wilshire Blvd., 10Th Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90010

CREASON & AARVIG LLP

32 Executive Park Suite 105

Irvine, CA 92614-4722

COTKIN COLLINS & GINSBURG A P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3134

AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST

346 N Larchmont Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90004

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1B FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK BY TENET HEALTHSYSTEMDESERT INC. REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR OR

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL PREFERENCE WITHIN 60 DAYS BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK BY DESERT RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP, VICKI J PORTNOFF MD, JOHN LEARY MD REPRESENTED BY COTKIN COLLINS & GINSBURG A P.C. FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

MOTION TO/FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE

MOTION TO/FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE/DECL/MPAS ATTY FOR PLTF BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FILED

EX PARTE ORDER SHORTENING TIME

EX PARTE ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR MOTION FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE SETTING (GRANTED) BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE ROBERT G TAYLOR

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK BY DESERT HEART PHYSICIANS MEDICALGROUP INC REPRESENTED BY TUVERSON & HILLYARD FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTY PURS

DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTY PURSUANT T/SECTION 9 OF T/CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT JUDICIAL ADMIN STANDARDS FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK BY NARASIMHA P RAO MD REPRESENTED BY TUVERSON & HILLYARD FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR PREFEREN

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR PREFERENCE SETTING BY DEF DESERT REGIONAL EMDICAL CENTER FILED

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR TRIAL PR

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE SETTING BY DEFENDANTS FILED

170.6 FILED BY DESERT HEART PH

170.6 FILED BY DESERT HEART PHYSICIANS MEDICALGROUP INC, NARASIMHA P RAO MD AGAINST JUDGE CHRISTOPHER J. SHELDON GRANTED.

ORDER GRANTING TRIAL PREFERENC

ORDER GRANTING TRIAL PREFERENCE AND SETTING THE CASE FOR TRIAL; HONORABLE JUDGE JAMES STAFFORD HAWKINS.

NOTICE OF CMC MSC & TRIAL BY P

NOTICE OF CMC MSC & TRIAL BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HRG ON 4-

NOTICE OF RULING RE: HRG ON 4-19-04 FILED

EX PARTE RE: ORDER TO VACATE O

EX PARTE RE: ORDER TO VACATE OR CONT TRIAL BY DESERT HEART PHYSICIANS MEDICALGROUP INC, NARASIMHA P RAO MD FILED.

119 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketDATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketSUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • DocketREVIEW RE:NOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS, DEPOSITIONS ANDDECLARATION OF MAILING BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK REMOVE ATTORNEY KRAMER DEBOER ENDELICATO & KEANE FOR PARTY(S) NARASIMHA P RAO MD AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY CREASON & AARVIG LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2010
  • DocketABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ALLOWING COSTS RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS FOLLOWING TRIAL; HONORABLE JUDGE KENNETH W ANDREEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX COSTS FOLLOWING TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RE FEES/COSTS MAILED TO JUSTICE ANDREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILED: ORDER RESPECTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TAX

    Read MoreRead Less
305 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO/FOR TRIAL PREFERENCE/DECL/MPAS ATTY FOR PLTF BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2004
  • DocketEX PARTE HEARING RE ORDER GRANTING TRIAL PREFERENCE WITHIN 60 DAYS.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK BY DESERT RADIOLOGY MEDICAL GROUP, VICKI J PORTNOFF MD, JOHN LEARY MD REPRESENTED BY COTKIN COLLINS & GINSBURG A P.C. FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • DocketFILE SENT TO DEPT 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • DocketMOTION FEE PAID BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FOR EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR ORDER GRANTING TRIAL PREFERENCE WITHIN 60 DAYS BY PEGGY A WILCZAK, EUGENE J WILCZAK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/12/2004 OF PEGGY WILCZAK BY TENET HEALTHSYSTEMDESERT INC. REPRESENTED BY AGAJANIAN MCFALL WEISS TETREAULT & CRIST FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1B FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESERT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTERA CALIFORNIA is a litigant