Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 11:39:29 (UTC).

WICK vs GARCIA

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 WICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL A OTTOLIA and Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1834

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

DANIEL A OTTOLIA

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM WICK

KIMBERLY AYERS

Defendants

NOELIA GARCIA

INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE

INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL LAW

Attorney at SIEGEL LAW

6568 Beachview Dr #109

Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275

Defendant Attorneys

PORTER SCOTT APC

350 University Ave. #200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Christopher Michael Egan

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

06/28/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing

02/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint WILLIAM WICK by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

01/12/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint WILLIAM WICK by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

Amended Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint WILLIAM WICK by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

01/12/2021: Amended Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer on 2nd Amended Complaint WILLIAM WICK by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing

12/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement

12/01/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Document Return.

11/10/2020: Notice of Document Return.

2nd Amended Complaint WILLIAM WICK

11/04/2020: 2nd Amended Complaint WILLIAM WICK

Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint of WICK by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

10/13/2020: Legacy Minute Order: Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint of WICK by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

Stipulation to change hearing date of Inspirations Home Care V's Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint filed.

09/28/2020: Stipulation to change hearing date of Inspirations Home Care V's Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint filed.

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint on 10/13/20 at 8:30 in Department 4.

09/23/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing re: Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint on 10/13/20 at 8:30 in Department 4.

Notice of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V filed.

08/31/2020: Notice of Demurrer to First Amended Complaint by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V filed.

Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of/to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V filed.

08/31/2020: Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of/to Demurrer to First Amended Complaint by INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V filed.

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h) as to SIEGEL LAW, WILLIAM WICK, KIMBERLY AYERS; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a default judgment pursuant to CRC 3.110(h)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: INSPIRATIONS HOME CARE V

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: WILLIAM WICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 08/28/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #2411 Receipt No.: CV200828-0178-OR.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of 1st Amended Complaint of WICK as to NOELIA GARCIA with receipt date of 07/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint of WICK Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/23/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #9849 Receipt No.: CV200623-0581-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of KIMBERLY AYERS PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32 & CODE 15657.3 filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92881.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of WICK and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Egan, Christopher M